Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Taylor, Jessica, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Garcia, Emilio Navarro, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Authorization to Appear | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.