Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mitchell, Deann R, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Mitchell, Elizabeth A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions40 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time50 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Receipt | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
SC Court Trial Plaintiff's Claim
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Sent | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.