Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reed, Cindy, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cone, Diane E, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Time To Trial38 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time108 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Response | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Request | |
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.