Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Evelynn Marie, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Davis, Kathrine Ann, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Time To Trial42 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time67 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Request | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Amended SC - No Fee | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.