Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time488 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Bail/Trust Forfeited | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Check Trust Mailed to Defendant | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerks Trust Refund Request | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Refer to Docket | |
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Conversion Close |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.