Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time500 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Subservice | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim - Amended |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.