Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
October 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.