Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kim E. McBride Pera presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim E. McBride Pera Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2014 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time598 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.