Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2012 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time454 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
February 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended Order | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.