Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2011 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.