Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee | |
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Sent | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.