Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time620 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Subservice | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Court Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.