Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Judge, Visiting presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Visiting Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions133 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time133 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
June 22, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Appeal - Small Claims Transmittal to Lower Court | |
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Trial de Novo
Judge: Smith, Michael R |
|
October 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Trial de Novo Small Claims Appeal | |
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
September 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Appeal - Notice of Filing of Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.