Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2010 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Invalid | |
June 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Application and Order | |
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.