Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time52 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Subservice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.