Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time52 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings | |
May 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment SC | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Refer to Docket | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Trial de Novo
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Trial de Novo Small Claims Appeal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.