Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen R. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions40 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Exhibit List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.