Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Timothy J. Evans presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy J. Evans Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claims (Conversion) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions39 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time39 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
February 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
February 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
February 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 03, 2005 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 30, 2004 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.