Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Geweke Company, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Sonato-Rodriquez, Luis, Rodarte, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2005 |
CategorySmall Claims > 12 Claims Filed |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time1816 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
March 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
September 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.