Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baldwin Trucking Inc filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lakeview Petroleum, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Kathleen R. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen R. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims Appeals |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time622 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal - Remittitur Filed | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - No Service | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal - Judgment Upheld | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Appeal - Judgment with Opinion | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial de Novo
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.