Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tatum, Rene, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Perez, Michael Ezequiel, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Reed, David W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReed, David W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: September 17, 2021*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: October 22, 2021*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment, CH-100 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.