Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.G. Glass, Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Gary, Todd B, against Dawkins, Susan, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
Category20: Unlimited Enforcement Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Date: November 08, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case
Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Case Management Statement |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Order of Examination: Non-Appealed Case FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR SUSAN DAWKINS Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited ANSWER |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED SUSAN DAWKINS WITH SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ACTION FOR CIVIL ENFORCEMENT, NOTICE OF RELATED CASE, APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, CIVIL SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION DOCUMENTS, ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND THINGS AT TRAIL OR HEARING AND DELCARATION ON 10/4/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.