Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Chand, Katherine, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Cammack, Stephen T, against Chand, Yashvir, Stra, Destaney Marie, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: December 06, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: December 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance -- All Counsel |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference /Status of Default Judgment Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance by all appearing Parties and Counsel. |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion - Plaintiff |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance Attorney |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement; FILED BY PLINTIFF KATHERINE CHAND | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte Interested Party Breckenridge Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.