Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hechtl, James John, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Kijanka, Kooper Lee, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLASH DRIVE SENT TO DEPT 9 |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Received FLASH DRIVE FROM RESP |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FLASH DRIVE SENT TO IS DEPT |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL: SERVED JAMES JOHN HECHTL WITH CH-120 AND USB THUMBDRIVE WITH POTENTIAL EVIDENCE FOR HEARING ON 9/23/2021 | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED KOOPER KIJANKA E/ TRO ON 8/22/2021 |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney ALBERTO M ELLIS IN PLACE OF PRO PER FOR RESP. |
|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.