Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Buford, Mary, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zazzi, Kimberli C, against General Motors Llc, represented by Shugart, Jonathan M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2021 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: December 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JURY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED GENERAL MOTORS LLC WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 8/10/21 |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: PLEASE RESUBMIT WITHOUT THE ONE LEGAL LLC ORDER FORM AND JUST THE PROOF OF SERVICE FOR FILING. |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.