Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Carney, Tatiana, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Walker, Latatia, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED LATITIA WALKER WITH REQUEST FOR CHRO, TEMPORARY CHRO, NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/13/2021 |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Restraining Order | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment, CH-100 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.