Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Carney, Tatiana, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Walker, Bryanni, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: August 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Restraining Order After Hearing EXPIRES: 8/25/2024 AT MIDNIGHT |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED LATATIA WALKER FOR BRYANNI WALKER, A MINOR WITH REQUEST FOR CHRO, TEMPORARY CHRO, NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/13/2021 |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Restraining Order | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MCADAM FOR SIGNATURE ON NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denied ORDER ON REQUEST TO KEEP MINOR'S INFORMATION CONFIDENTIAL |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment, CH-100 | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK |
|
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO KEEP MINORS INFORMATION CONFIDENTIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.