Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cunningham, Amanda, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Han, Douglas, against Cottonwood H.C., Inc. D B A Cottonwood Post-Acute Rehab, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Daniel M. Wolk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Wolk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
Category15: Unlimited Other Employment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF; ATTACHED PROOF OF SERVICE |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER THERE ON |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SENT TO JUDGE WOLK FOR REVIEW |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited FILED BY DEFENDANT COTTONWOOD H.C. D/B/A/ COTTONWOOD POST-ACUTE REHAB |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SUBSERVED COTTONWOOD H.C. INC DBA COTTONWOOD POST-ACUTE REHAB, A NEVADA CORPORATION WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 8/4/21; MAILED ON 8/5/21 |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
First Paper Filed - Fee COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL PENALTIES FOR VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE 2698 et seq. (PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004) |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.