Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Carranza, Maricela C, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schaff, Jeffrey M, against Janico Building Services, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, D B A Amtrak, represented by Schmaeling, Daniel T, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: THE CASE NUMBER IS INCORRECT PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT WITH ADVANCED JURY FEES TO MAKE SURE THE $150.00 GENERATES |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents ANS - WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: YOU HAVE 2 DEFENDANTS THAT REQUIRED A FIRST APPEARANCE FEE OF $435.00 EACH. PLEASE CORRECT FEES. YOU MAY SCAN YOUR ANSWER TWICE IF NEEDED TO ADD THE CORRECT FEES. |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.