Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Davenport, Glen Allen, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Roth, Harry David, against Xxxxxxxx, Xxxxxxxx M., represented by Lansburgh, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2021 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause RE SANCTIONS/DISM; CMC Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing OSC RE SANCTIONS/DISM; CMC MIN ORD |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE SANCTIONS/DISM |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited FILED BY xxxxxxxxxxxxxxxxx |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SUBSERVED xxxxxxxx M xxxxxxxx WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 09/30/2021; MAILED ON 10/01/2021 |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE SAMUEL T. MCADAM |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.