Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Reyes, Maria Ruth, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Allen, Jude Ross, against Heald, Roddy Haskell, Republic Electric West, Inc., Republic Elite Integration Inc., represented by Mcbride, Evan M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
*Case Management Conference
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 4 DAYS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Handing Attorney | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference / OSC RE SERVICE Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY RODDY HASKELL HEALD, REPUBLIC ELITE |
|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents ANSWER - WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: I HAVE LEFT SEVERAL MESSAGES REGARDING FEES AND NO RESPONSE TO DATE. THERE ARE 3 DEFENDANTS THAT REQUIRE FIRST APPEARANCE FEES OF $435.00 EACH. PLEASE RESUBMIT WITH THE ADDED FEES OR PERMISSION IN THE COMMENTS TO ADD THE ADDITIONAL FEES. YOU MAY RESUBMIT THROUGH E-FILE AND CALL TO PY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES OVER THE PHONE IF NEEDED AT 530-406-6704 |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.