Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Velasquez, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gingery, Justin M, against Andeman Company, Davis Ace Hardware, Davis Lumber & Hardware Company, Lifestyle Davis Llc Dba Davis Ace Hardware, Lifetime Davis Re Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Shane, Jason B, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFT LIFESTYLE DAVIS LLC DBA DAVIS ACE HARDWARE |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited DEFT LIFESTYLE DAVIS LLC DBA DAVIS ACE HARDWARE'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT; SIGNED 6/21/2021 BY LIFESTYLE DAVIS LLC DBA DAVIS ACE HARDWARE |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed AS TO DEFTS DAVIS LUMBER & HARDWARE COMPANY AND ANDEMAN COMPANY ONLY |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY SUBSTITUTED SEVICE SERVED ANDEMAN COMPANY WITH SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND ADR PACKET ON 5/28/21 AND MAILED ON 5/28/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.