Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Horton, Cindy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Spangler, Tim S, against Romey'S Liquors, Sahota, Devinder Singh, Sahota Enterprises, Inc., represented by Kaiman, Barry G, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING (Comment) | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFT DEVINDER SINGH SAHOTA DBA ROMEYS LIQUORS |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SUBSERVED SAHOTA ENTERPRISES, INC. WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ON 5/23/2021 AND MAILED ON 5/24/2021 BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SUBSERVED DEVINDER SINGH SAHOTA WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ON 5/23/2021 AND MAILED ON 5/24/2021 BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED ROMEY'S LIQUORS WITH SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, AND STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ON 5/18/2021 BY PERSONAL SERVICE |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ELECTRONICALLY SERVED ATTORNEYS FOR DEFT ROMEY'S LIQUORS; SAHOTA ENTERPRISES INC, DEVINDER SINGH SAHOTA WITH NOTICE OF CMC ON 2/8/21 |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.