Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gamino, Anabel Sanchez, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Romano, Mark, against Fca Us Llc, represented by Proudfoot, Matthew M, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
*Case Management Conference
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable) Notice of Posting Jury Fees |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement Case Management Statement |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF RULING, FILED BY DEFT |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: DUPLICATE FILINGS AND PAYMENT. |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY DEFT FCA US LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.