Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Frick, Heather Mundy, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Dorr, Ron T, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: May 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Restraining Order After Hearing EXPIRES: 5/12/2022 AT MIDNIGHT |
|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service INCOMPLETE |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To TRO AND NOTICE OF HEARING SENT TO JUDGE MCADAM |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing ON 5/12/2021 AT 9AM IN D10 |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment, CH-100 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE MCADAM |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment TRO | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.