Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Heim, Oliver, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Sanchez, Andrea V, against Arif, Sajida, Chevron Corporation, Franchise Worldwide Headquarters, Llc, Iman Enterprises, Reed Avenue Food Mart, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Baytosh, Karen M, Breitbart, Amy H, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
Category23: Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: August 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed FOR CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY IMAN ENTERPRISES |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cross Complaint - No Fee IMAN ENTERPRISES, SAJIDA ARIF, SUBWAY 27214, AND FRANCHISE WORLDWIDE HEADQUARTERS, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST REED AVENUE FOOD MART, INC FOR IMPLIED AND EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, NEGLIGENCE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY REED AVENUE FOOD MART, INC. DEFENDANT |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee DEFENDANT IMAN ENTERPRISES, SAJIDA ARIF, SUBWAY 27214, AND FRANCHISE WORLDWIDE HEADQUARTERS LLC'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT REED AVENUE FOOD MART INC'S CROSS COMPLAINT |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management / Status Conference Statement FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cross Complaint - No Fee OF REED AVENUE FOOD MART, INC. |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited DEFT REED AVENUE FOOD MART INC.'S ANSWER TO PLTFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CHEVERON USA INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.