Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rural Community Assistance Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Finch, Gregory M, against Hofmann, Michael, The Valley Home Rice Company, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2021 |
Category37: Unlimited Other Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Receipt of Transfer RECEIPT OF DOCUMENTS-CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Transfer Out STANISLAUS COUNTY |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order FOR CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To STIP AND PROPOSED ORD FOR CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service SERVED The Valley Home Rice Company, LLC W/ SUMMONS AND CMPT ON 4/14/2021 | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Michael Hofmann W/ SUMMS AND CMPLT ON 4/14/2021 | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.