Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert S, against Doty, Jack C, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
Category09: Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: July 24, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial: Court (1-2 hours) Judge: Rosenberg, David |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance -- Gloria Zarco; Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To CAL SHELF FOR HEARING 1/11/24 DEPT 11; PROPOSED JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents (Proposed) Judgment After Trial by Court |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed FILED BY ATTNY FOR PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA -Trial Brief (Briefs) |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance Notice (Appearances) | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice FILED BY ATTNY FOR PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA Notice to Appear at Trial and to Produce Books, Documents or Other Things (Comment) |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice FILED BY ATTNY FOR PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA -Exhibit List (Comment) |
|
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed FILED BY ATTNY FOR PLTF BANK OF AMERICA NA Witness List (Comment) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.