Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Hogue, Ruth, filed a(n) 24: Unlimited Product Liability case represented by Garber, Cynthia, against Boehriner Ingelheim Usa Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Llc, Sanofi Us Services, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
Category24: Unlimited Product Liability |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Case Management Conference
Date: July 12, 2021Order to Show Cause
Date: July 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal NOT ENTERED; PARTIES DISMISSED ON 7/19/2023. |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Party Dismissed AS TO DEFENDANTS BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM USA CORPORATION, SANOFI US SERVICES, INC., AND SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC ONLY |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Party Dismissed | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ADDITION OF CASE TO JCCP 5150 FILED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition AND NOTICE OF POTENTIAL ADD-ON CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION |
|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.