Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Muniozguren, Agustin, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Sanchez, Jesse S., in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: May 06, 2021*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: June 10, 2021*Request for Order: Harassment
Date: July 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Denied PARTIES ARE NO LONGER HAVING ISSUES |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK RE ORDER ON REQUEST |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Request for Order: Harassment Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.