Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Strategic Funding Source, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Levin, Paul A, against Advantage Auto Motors Llc, Minnikoff, Sergei, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Case Management Conference
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Ex Parte BY Pltf Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF NON-SERVICE AS TO ADVANTAGE AUTO MOTORS LLC |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SERGEI MINNIKOFF WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 4/3/2021 BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE AND MAILED ON 4/6/2021 |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.