Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ceja, Vidal, Puentes-Ceja, Erika, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Murray, William J, Rich, Robert P, against Daniel Puentes, Does 1-50, Inclusive, Dpg Trucking,Inc, Tamplen, Georgina, represented by Burton, John H, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Fall, Timothy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFall, Timothy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2020 |
Category06: Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Trial: Court
Date: November 14, 2022*Trial Readiness Conference
Date: October 31, 2022*Ex Parte
Date: July 03, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: June 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte Re: Settlement Judge: Fall, Timothy L. |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DEPT. 11 FOR EX PARTE ON 7/03/23 WITH PROPOSED ORDER, PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION, AND DECLARATIONS |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents PROPOSED JUDGMENT |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION LYNN EDWARDS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF WILLIAM J. MURRAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF ROBERT P. RICH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT STIPULATION |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.