Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rampulla, Leslie Karen, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Weigant, Mary Ann, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List PETITIONER'S |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Restraining Order | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED MARY ANN WEIGANT W/ NOTICE OF HEARING, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON 12/31/2020 |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY LESLIE KAREN RAMPULLA |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY LESLIE KAREN RAMPULLA- USB TO IT DEPT VIA INTEROFFICE MAIL |
|
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY RANDALL WEIGANT |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLK |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE WOLK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.