Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dominguez, Erick Jose, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thuesen, Mark S, against Baltin, Dara Shelby, represented by Foster, Luke A, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: June 28, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 3 DAYS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ALL APPEARING COUNSEL |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granted REMOTE APPEARANCE - VIDEOCONFERENCE ONLY: All parties and counsel, all proceedings in Department 10 |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents NTC OF REMOTE APPEARANCE - WE ARE RETURNING THIS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: THIS FORM IS 3 PAGES; ALL PAGES ARE REQUIRED FOR FILING. PLEASE RESUBMIT |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Returned Documents NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE-THIS FILING IS BEING RETURNED BECAUSE THE SECOND PAGE IS NOT DATED OR SIGNED. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Of Remote Appearance | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management / Status Conference Statement | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.