Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Page, Schitara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lalezary, Shawn, against Khang, Chee, Official Pest Prevention Inc., represented by Dieffenbach, Richard P, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
Category22: Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2021*Motion
Date: May 27, 2021*Ex Parte
Date: February 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 4 days Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Jury 4 DAYS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Court 3 DAYS Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Trial Readiness Conference
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Ex Parte RE: DEF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.