Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brooks, Karen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Gurtej, Gill, Ig Holdings Llc, represented by Vorobets, Alla V, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
Category35: Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Ex Parte
Date: December 29, 2020*Motion
Date: March 12, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition RE SANCTIONS/DISM Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review FEE WAIVER Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE MCADAM FOR REVIEW OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Motion for App of Writ of Possession and Evid Hrg Setting Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND SANCTIONS ADDRESSED TO KAREN BROOKS |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Case Management Conference Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Motion APP TO WAIVE FEES Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing OSC RE SANCTIONS TO PLTF |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause RE SANCTIONS/DISM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.