Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Barnes, Elizabeth Janet, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcAdam, Samuel T. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryName Change |
Last RefreshedJuly 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: January 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree CHANGING NAME |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof / Affidavit of Publication WOODLAND DAILY DEMOCRAT ON 12/29/2020, 01/05/21, 01/12/21, 01/19/21 |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents DECREE CHANGING NAME |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause FOR CHANGE OF NAME |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To OSC SENT TO JUDGE WOLK |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE DANIEL M. WOLK |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To FEE WAIVER SENT TO JUDGE WOLK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.