Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kunkel, Thomas, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Banks, Keith, against Ross, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Hohenwarter, Catherine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHohenwarter, Catherine Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2020 |
Category32: Limited Residential Unlawful Detainer - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Trial: Court
Date: January 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Unlawful Detainer Minute Order *Trial: Court UNLAWFUL DETAINER Judge: Hohenwarter, Catherine |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Judgment for Plaintiff Judgment forthcoming by Attn Banks |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice OF TRIAL |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum FILED BY PLTFF |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED JOSHUA ROSS WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON 12/15/20 |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons Unknown Occupant | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED KEITH BANKS WITH ANSWER ON 12/21/2020 BY MAIL |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited up to $10,000 | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of UD Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.