Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hansen, Melissa Kathleen, filed a(n) Civil Harrassment case against Mckinnon, Danielle, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Harrassment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED DAVID FOOS, ESQ. WITH DECL OF DANIELLE MCKINNON ON 11/30/2020 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY RESP |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filed PET'S ADDITIONAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CIVIL HARASSMENT RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed PET'S REPLY MEMORANDUM TO RESP'S RESPONSE |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of ELECTRONIC SERVICE SERVED MATTHEW ROY WITH ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON 11/18/2020 |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Harassment
Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AMENDED POS |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing Civil Harassment/TRO | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney DAVID P. FOOS, ESQ. IN PLACE OF PRO PER PET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.