Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mutual Housing Management, filed a(n) 43: Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case against Windham, Rosalyn Angela, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Wolk, Daniel M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWolk, Daniel M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 19, 2020 |
Category43: Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
|
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: November 09, 2020*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition
Date: December 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Law and Motion Minute Order *Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition CNT FROM 11-9-20 TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Granted CHRO; ATTY CLEMENTS TO PREPARE ORDER |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Supplemental EXHIBITS FOR RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED ROSALYN ANGELA WINDHAM WITH SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS ON 12/8/2020 BY ELECTRONIC MAIL |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED ROSALYN ANGELA WINDHAM WITH NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE, AMENDED NOTICE OF COURT HEARING, AMENDED PETITION FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRANING ORDERS W/ EXHIBITS ON 11-18-2020 |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause Pre-Disposition WORKPLACE VIOLENCE Judge: Wolk, Daniel M |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion AT PETITIONERS REQUEST TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WOLD FOR REVIEW OF AMENDED WVRO |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Denied Restraining Order AMENDED |
|
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.